fucking japanese. Mind blown, and it's so simple. Where the 10's meet you get 100's where the 10's and 1's meet you get 10's And where the 1's meet you get 1's. dat math
Upload
Login or register
Leave a comment Refresh Comments (75)
[ 75 comments ]
Anonymous comments allowed.
35 comments displayed.
#2 - sinery
Reply +35
(09/26/2013) [-]
I don't understand it; thus it is inferior.
13*10=130 --> 130+13+13=156
Desc too long.
#3 to #2 - leted
Reply +1
(09/27/2013) [-]
I like it.
#44 to #2 - hates
Reply +1
(09/27/2013) [-]
To simplify the Japanese way, they have lines for the 1 3 and 1 2, and then you draw the circles and oval. You count up how many intersections are in each circle, and that's your number
#19 - anon
Reply 0
(09/27/2013) [-]
try 77 x 77. this **** do not work
#23 to #19 - uraharajunior
Reply +16
(09/27/2013) [-]
I just did and it worked fine, i'd post a pic but im level 0 so i can't.

77 x 77

10's hits 10's 49 times
10's and 1's hit 98 times
1's and 1's hit 49 times

49 98 49 gives 5929

Which is the correct answer according to my calculator so yeah..
it works
#68 to #23 - meistarijoi
Reply 0
(09/27/2013) [-]
I'm pretty sure this does not work. I tried 6791209*97483846 and got it wrong.
#74 to #68 - goldenfairy
Reply 0
(09/27/2013) [-]
I was bored. I tried. 10 minutes later I had first few and few last digits correct, but in the middle I ended up with a lot multiplication and addition mistakes, was too lazy to fix, but overall this method works.
#70 to #68 - uraharajunior
Reply 0
(09/27/2013) [-]
I'm not even sure how to apply this method to more than 2 digit number.

And by that i mean i have no idea
#43 to #23 - peanutmonkey
Reply -2
(09/27/2013) [-]
how the **** is 499849 = 5929 ?!
#45 to #43 - uraharajunior
Reply +1
(09/27/2013) [-]
Forgot to say that
49 is hundreds
98 is tens
and the last 49 is ones
so that gives 4900 + 980 + 49 which equals 5929

Sorry, i'm not great at explaining
#48 to #45 - peanutmonkey
Reply -2
(09/27/2013) [-]
good. dis make more betterer sense.
#51 to #48 - uraharajunior
Reply 0
(09/27/2013) [-]
Glad i could help
#35 - smoothmcgroove
Reply +8
(09/27/2013) [-]
#12 - fuckinfuckinfuck ONLINE
Reply +8
(09/27/2013) [-]
Or you can just do 13*10 + 13*2...
#22 to #12 - tcbhale
Reply 0
(09/27/2013) [-]
**tcbhale rolled a random image posted in comment #3955021 at Friendly ** Made alot more sence
#38 - vanoreo
Reply +7
(09/27/2013) [-]
I'm using a trackpad don't make fun of me
3x2, 2x1 =
drop zero to next level
1x13, put before zero
add products
#71 to #38 - nonanonnon
Reply 0
(09/27/2013) [-]
That's what I was taught at least. That method doesn't require being asian or 3 different colored markers on hand.
#30 - anotheroneonearth ONLINE
Reply +5
(09/27/2013) [-]
I'm Japanese and thought it was totally normal, what's so surprising?   
also this is how we confess love
I'm Japanese and thought it was totally normal, what's so surprising?
also this is how we confess love
#31 to #30 - mcstorms ONLINE
Reply 0
(09/27/2013) [-]
in murrica we put the numbers over one another.
#9 - heyhihey
Reply +4
(09/27/2013) [-]
We were just taught to memorize all of the numbers.....**** me
#59 to #9 - soupkittenagain
Reply 0
(09/27/2013) [-]
When and where?
#1 - wardd
Reply +4
(09/26/2013) [-]
Mathematical proof

AB * CD
= (A*10 + B) * (C*10 + D)
= A*C + 10*A*D + 10*B*C + 10*10*A*C
= A*C + 10*(A*D + B*C) + 100*A*C

I'm a physics student
#5 to #1 - lemoron ONLINE
Reply 0
(09/27/2013) [-]
yay physics
#6 to #1 - PhantomDog
Reply 0
(09/27/2013) [-]
Well only one problem. The first part of it is supposed to be B*D, not A*C. However, besides that, it is a nice proof
#20 to #1 - elcapiltan
Reply +2
(09/27/2013) [-]
Almost right, first term in the last line should be B*D
Almost right, first term in the last line should be B*D
#63 - mereu
Reply +2
(09/27/2013) [-]
I've been trying to understand this for the past 30 minutes and it still makes my head dizzy. I still find it easier the conventional way. Or maybe i'm just stupid
#64 to #63 - Hybricide
Reply 0
(09/27/2013) [-]
I don't understand this method and I had difficulty learning the way most kids are taught in the US.   
   
My brain just can't comprehend.
I don't understand this method and I had difficulty learning the way most kids are taught in the US.

My brain just can't comprehend.
#69 to #63 - galkawhm
Reply 0
(09/27/2013) [-]
Count where the lines cross over.

The first number is the top left corner. The 2nd number is the top right and bottom left. the third number is the bottom right.

the circles look like a % sign.
#54 - soupkittenagain
0
has deleted their comment [-]
#56 to #54 - soupkittenagain
Reply 0
(09/27/2013) [-]
Nevermind I figured it out from the comments. I need to put 2 zeroes behind the 8 and 1 zero behind the 22. Then add them all up.
#57 to #54 - GoukakyoNoJutsu
Reply +2
(09/27/2013) [-]
800 + 220 + 12 = 1032
#58 to #57 - soupkittenagain
Reply 0
(09/27/2013) [-]
Yeah my comment #56 figured it out.
#60 to #58 - GoukakyoNoJutsu
Reply 0
(09/27/2013) [-]
yeah I was writing my reply as you replied
#61 to #60 - soupkittenagain
Reply 0
(09/27/2013) [-]
Well if I hadn't figured it out, you would have helped. Thanks though.
#62 to #61 - GoukakyoNoJutsu
Reply 0
(09/27/2013) [-]
no problem