Asians. .. I dunno man. 23 x 15? 20 x 15 = 300 3 x 15 = 45 300 + 45 = 345. Pretty simple. And I don't need all of that mess with the lines and it saves space on paper. Asians I dunno man 23 x 15? 20 15 = 300 3 45 + 345 Pretty simple And don't need all of that mess with the lines and it saves space on paper
Upload
Login or register
Leave a comment Refresh Comments (8)
Anonymous comments allowed.
8 comments displayed.
#7 - warrenzthehero
Reply +3
(07/17/2013) [-]
I dunno man.
23 x 15?
20 x 15 = 300
3 x 15 = 45
300 + 45 = 345.
Pretty simple. And I don't need all of that mess with the lines and it saves space on paper.
#1 - threadz
Reply +2
(07/16/2013) [-]
this is just the same as long multiplication but you have to draw a **** ton of lines to make it work
#8 - justaris
Reply 0
(07/17/2013) [-]
I like this method
19*17 = ???
20*17 = 340
340 -17 = 323
19*17 = 323
#6 - anon
Reply 0
(07/17/2013) [-]
If you didn't get that from the original picture, then you probably don't deserve to know how to maths.
#5 - heartlessrobot
Reply 0
(07/17/2013) [-]
This seems like a lot of work for something incredibly easy.
#4 - imaginer
Reply 0
(07/17/2013) [-]
There's a reason you learn it in PRIMARY school: It teaches the BASICS of multiplication and how it happens.

Go use this method to do 19 * 77 and I'll call you if you have any fun.
#3 - lamkat
Reply 0
(07/17/2013) [-]
456x93321.3 Ain`t so easy now huh ?
#2 - naitsabesh ONLINE
Reply 0
(07/16/2013) [-]
This image has expired
and it just takes a pencil, a ruler, the ability to draw all kinds of circles and half an infinity.