Math. . How 'elicit, numbers in aii: Mill I illegit THIS"?! I Blir FE: Elf .. I tried to do this with 8284=? and I was just like 100-82= ... 100-82= ... 100-82=... 100-82= ... I think I am what is wrong with the American educational syste math tumblr
Upload
Login or register
Hide Comments
Leave a comment Refresh Comments (263)
[ 263 comments ]
Anonymous comments allowed.
asd
#21 - flyleafistheshit
Reply +196 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
I tried to do this with 82*84=? and I was just like 100-82= ...
100-82= ...

100-82=...

100-82= ...

I think I am what is wrong with the American educational system.
#44 to #21 - anon id: 6f31c33b
Reply 0 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
So... and now, whats 16x18?
#213 to #44 - anon id: 7537e254
Reply 0 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
288
#93 to #21 - anon id: a7898901
Reply 0 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
I call it "Captcha Syndrome"
User avatar #62 to #21 - bagguhsleep
Reply +1 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
It'd be easier to just separate the equation into (82*80)+(82*4).
User avatar #75 to #62 - psykobear
Reply +6 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
Take it even further:
(82*8)*10 + (82*4)
Further:
((80*8)+(2*8))*10 + (80*4)+(2*4)
FURTHER:
(((8*8)*10)+(2*8))*10 + ((8*4)*10)+(2*4)
Now just start at the innermost parenthesis and work outward:
((64*10) + 16)*10 + 32*10 + 8
(640 + 16)*10 + 320 + 8
6560 + 320 + 8
6880 + 8
6888
82 * 84 = 6888
#207 to #75 - anon id: cd6b0fc5
Reply 0 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
and you can do that in your head can you?
User avatar #238 to #207 - psykobear
Reply +1 123456789123345869
(07/05/2013) [-]
Well, yes, but I skip a few steps. I was trying to be thorough in my explanation, since this content only applies to a few instances.
User avatar #208 to #21 - ponieskilledmyacc
Reply +2 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
I got stuck at 18x16... this method isn't that easier..
#244 to #208 - thumbsupforyou
Reply +1 123456789123345869
(07/05/2013) [-]
18*16=10*(18+6)+8*6=240+48=288
Works for all numbers between 10 and 20, just notice that you have to subtract 10 after adding the numbers (or just not adding the 10 at all like I did)

Too bad I have no idea how to make 100-82 easier in any way
User avatar #245 to #244 - ponieskilledmyacc
Reply +1 123456789123345869
(07/05/2013) [-]
I usually just do 100-90+10-2
User avatar #41 to #21 - mrhotwings
Reply +11 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
I always have trouble with these type of problems until I thought of doing this.
Problem: 100-82
Remove the two from 82: 100-80=20
Bring in the two: 20-2=18
100-82=18
I seriously hoped this helped, I am rather bad when it comes to explaining things.
P.S. I said the word problem so many times, it doesn't even sound like a word anymore....
#231 to #41 - anon id: 13f9e80b
Reply 0 123456789123345869
(07/05/2013) [-]
I think of it as 82 + 8 = 90
90 + 10 = 100

answer is 18
User avatar #149 to #41 - tabarzins
Reply 0 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
I always did it like this:
start : 100-82
Subtract 2 from 10: 10 - 2 = 8
Subtract 8+1 from 10: 10 - 9 = 1
put em together and 18
#45 to #41 - anon id: 30f3e60a
Reply 0 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
***************************************************'**************************** ***********************'***************************************************'**** ***********************************************'******************************** *******************'***************************************************'******** *******************************************'************************************ ***************'***************************************************'************ ***************************************'**************************************** ***********'***************************************************'**************** ***********************************'******************************************** *******'***************************************************'******************** *******************************'************************************************ ***'***************************************************'************************ ****************************************
User avatar #46 to #45 - mrhotwings
Reply +7 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
Um.... thanks?
#35 - ninegagleader
Reply +114 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
#37 to #35 - anon id: e4791cde
Reply 0 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
9312!
3 times 3 = 9
3
1 + 2 = 3
User avatar #70 to #37 - snowshark
Reply +3 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
333... the number of the beast...
#163 to #35 - deandrummer
Reply +2 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
Last Guardian confirmed
#219 to #35 - nymikemet
Reply +3 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
Just in case you didn't see it
#3 - CyrilKeir
Reply -63 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
Or just use this?
Or just use this?
#269 to #3 - anon id: 99f8b6fc
Reply 0 123456789123345869
(06/16/2014) [-]
I can see you. I know where you live.
I can see you. I know where you live.
#58 to #3 - icameheretotroll
Reply +6 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
Comment Picture
#170 to #58 - poncakeforlife
Reply +5 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
Comment Picture
User avatar #4 to #3 - CyrilKeir
Reply +78 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
Why is it not enlarging....
User avatar #5 to #4 - CyrilKeir
Reply +17 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
Here. Use this link instead, people.

You need to login to view this link
#7 to #5 - weinerdick
0 123456789123345869
has deleted their comment [-]
User avatar #99 to #4 - dafuckisthisshit
Reply +3 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
sounds like a personal problem
User avatar #11 to #4 - quazyjash
Reply +3 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
it's a gif, gifs aren't able to enlarge.
User avatar #173 to #4 - nodforfunny
Reply +1 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
That's what she said....
#145 to #4 - shatt
Reply +1 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
because funnyjunk hates you
User avatar #43 to #4 - lilnuggetbob
Reply +1 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
Its a Gif
User avatar #34 to #4 - traelos
Reply +1 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
GIF
#40 - romdadon
Reply +71 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
what if the numbers are greater than a hundred
User avatar #127 to #40 - jokerja
Reply +2 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
Use a nearby calculator or asian
#54 to #40 - grandterskrasao
Reply +6 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
subtract from 1000...
#67 to #54 - anon id: ac37a244
Reply 0 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
But what about numbers less than a hundred but greater than 1000...? You can't explain that.
#137 to #67 - grandterskrasao
Reply +5 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
less... than a hundred.. but greater than 1000? ... wut? I know i haven't had too advanced math, my highest being half a class of trig, but im pretty sure there is no such number.
#148 to #137 - nickypickle
Reply +8 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
I'm pretty sure he was just making a joke.
I'm pretty sure he was just making a joke.
User avatar #68 - kimkve
Reply +47 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
Please do 47*63....

100-47 = 53
100-63 = 37

53+37 = 90
53*37 = ****!
#96 to #68 - anon id: eb308834
Reply 0 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
well you can do
47*6=282
282*10=2820 this is equal to 47*60 now we just have to add the 3 other times remaining.
47*3=141+2820=2961

Or jus put it in the calculator. Either is fine with me
#236 to #68 - anon id: 3805ccb0
Reply 0 123456789123345869
(07/05/2013) [-]
When you multiply large numbers, always multiply by the number closest to 10 or 5 as possible, in your situation I would say to myself

37 x 100 = 3700
3700 / 2 = 1850 (which is the same as 37 x 50)
37 x 3 = 111
1850 + 111 = 1961
User avatar #104 to #68 - drulludanni
Reply +1 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
what i would do is change it to 50*60 = 3000
then + 3* 50 to get 60 to 63 again so its 50*63=3150 and then - 3* 63 to change 50 to 47 which equals 2961. It might not be the easiest way but it works and is faster than the conventional way in most cases and its what i use most of the time when multiplying in the head.
User avatar #147 to #68 - lmaopwnt
Reply +1 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
You could just do 53x40 (2,120) then just subtract 159 (53x3) from that.
That would give you 1,961. and 100-90 is 10, so your answer would be 2,961.
#193 to #147 - psychrophile
Reply +2 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
If you're going to go through that extra work, why not just multiply 96x100 and subtract (3x96 = 288)?
User avatar #150 to #147 - davidavidson
Reply 0 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
can't do that in your head tho m8.
User avatar #155 to #150 - lmaopwnt
Reply +2 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
I did do it in my head, although I guess I forgot that i'm one of few that can.
#160 to #155 - davidavidson
Reply -1 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
You are just so smart. When are they making that movie about your smartness again?
#165 to #160 - lmaopwnt
Reply +4 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
Excuse me for trying to help someone, if you don't like not being able to do math then stop playing the dumbass and learn to do it yourself like I did. People overestimate the difficulty of math all the time, once you stop being intimidated by it and get the hang of it it's just as easy as doing it on paper.
Excuse me for trying to help someone, if you don't like not being able to do math then stop playing the dumbass and learn to do it yourself like I did. People overestimate the difficulty of math all the time, once you stop being intimidated by it and get the hang of it it's just as easy as doing it on paper.
#168 to #165 - davidavidson
Reply -1 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
I'm just giving you ****. I can do it do.

Take it easy tuffins
#125 - blackrunner
Reply +36 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
MS paint you know.
#224 to #125 - silverlance
Reply 0 123456789123345869
(07/05/2013) [-]
This is the worst thing I've seen all day all week all my life
#199 to #125 - hinedodmansmith **User deleted account**
+1 123456789123345869
has deleted their comment [-]
#218 to #199 - clockworkphysicist
Reply +3 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
Why are you here?
#132 to #125 - slapintheface
Reply +2 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
#203 - rel
Reply +26 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
Guys I think I broke it
#232 to #203 - anon id: b36bb6c9
Reply 0 123456789123345869
(07/05/2013) [-]
In this case the 96 would carry over and cancel with the -96, so it still works. It just doesn't make the computation any faster...
#237 to #203 - Alchemyst
Reply +1 123456789123345869
(07/05/2013) [-]
That's because the right side of the equation should read = 100*(100-(x+y)) + (100-x)*(100-y) .
#220 to #203 - yearofthemonkey
Reply +2 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
Well there is your answer
#16 - mrparkinglot
Reply +22 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
or you could... I don't know..... USE A CALCULATOR?   
   
   
I mean... they are everywhere now, on your phone, your computer on your.. yeah calculator
or you could... I don't know..... USE A CALCULATOR?


I mean... they are everywhere now, on your phone, your computer on your.. yeah calculator
User avatar #20 to #16 - zakaizer
Reply +6 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
Non-calculator exams? Where they expect you to do **** like this, I mean yeah, it's not that hard, just time consuming, using that method, you've got more time to tackle the harder **** in the paper.
User avatar #23 to #20 - mrparkinglot
Reply +4 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
You've got a point. I didn't think about that
#24 to #23 - zakaizer
Reply +2 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
'salright, I forgive you
#25 to #24 - mrparkinglot
Reply +2 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
People here does that??
People here does that??
#26 to #25 - zakaizer
Reply +3 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
Eh, sometimes, depends on how bad a mood I'm in, luckily, I'm pretty happy right now
Eh, sometimes, depends on how bad a mood I'm in, luckily, I'm pretty happy right now
#27 to #26 - mrparkinglot
Reply +2 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
User avatar #110 to #20 - lizardnigger
Reply +1 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
We could do that Japanese grid **** too
User avatar #113 to #110 - zakaizer
Reply +1 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
Aye, that works, I just find that one above easier to remember, plus I get confused counting lines, they always screw with my eyes....
User avatar #114 to #113 - lizardnigger
Reply +1 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
But in a non calculator exam...
Also, the grid method works
User avatar #116 to #114 - zakaizer
Reply +1 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
But that takes ages to draw out, that minute or so you save could be vital
User avatar #117 to #116 - lizardnigger
Reply +1 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
Meh, well, I'm a nerd and I usually have 20 minutes left for every hour
User avatar #118 to #117 - zakaizer
Reply +1 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
I'm predicted A*, but I highly doubt I'm going to get it, I think I'd be lucky to get an A, and I'm that twat who never stops looking at his paper, always meticulously going through it
User avatar #119 to #118 - lizardnigger
Reply +1 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
I got an A in my last maths exam
My teacher says I can get an A* so I did it again and tbh I'm expecting one
I check my exam, then sit there and do nothing and then steal water at the end of the exam
User avatar #120 to #119 - zakaizer
Reply +1 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
Well, I hope you get the marks, man, sucks to go through it again just to not improve
#121 to #120 - lizardnigger
Reply +1 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
thankyou     
the same for you and have a gif
thankyou
the same for you and have a gif
#31 - anon id: 803b0bbd
Reply 0 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
I don't like math 'tricks' unless I know why they work.
#122 to #31 - eyeballfrog
Reply +1 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
(100 - x)(100 - y) = 10000 - 100*x - 100*y + x*y = 100*(100 - (x + y)) + x*y

That's why it works.
User avatar #184 to #122 - infamoustrapper
Reply +1 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
"science"
User avatar #36 to #31 - dantemp
Reply +20 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
this one doesn't anyways
User avatar #6 - hounding
Reply +12 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
useless for anything less than 80*80ish because you would end up multiplying double digits anyway
ex: 78*75
22+25=
22*25=

why have i wasted 15 minutes of my life on this ._.
#65 to #6 - anon id: 51af472b
Reply 0 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
78 x 75

1. 100-78=22, 100-75=25
2. 22+25=47, 100-47=53
NOW: 5 will be your first digit. Save the 3 for later.
3. 22 x 25=550
NOW: Take the 3 from the last step, and add it to the first digit of this answer. Stick your first digit from earlier (5) in front.
4. 78 x 75= 5850
BItch.
User avatar #242 to #65 - hounding
Reply +1 123456789123345869
(07/05/2013) [-]
And now for how normal people do math in their head
78*75
78*70 =546(0)
78*5=390

5460+390=5850
But then again I am half asian...
User avatar #8 to #6 - Jwako
Reply +1 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
but you can just do it again with the new numbers
User avatar #9 to #8 - hounding
Reply +1 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
ok
22*25
78+75=
78*75= ummmm we were trying to solve that in the first place >.>

i actually had no idea that it would repeat until i did this
User avatar #10 to #9 - Jwako
Reply +1 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
oh **** i feel stupid now. 22*25 is easier than 78*75 tho
User avatar #13 to #6 - Shramin
Reply +1 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
22+25 = 47, 22 x 25 = ]22 x 10]+[22x10]+[22x5] = 220 + 220 + 110 = 550, Total is 47550?

at any rate that is how I solve math in my head, I simplify the Times sequence by cutting it into pieces.
User avatar #14 to #13 - Shramin
Reply +1 123456789123345869
(07/04/2013) [-]
at any rate the answer is wrong due to being 5850, unless .. 4700 + 550 = 5250... Nope still wrong.