how to math like asain. . Ito' tei' , tatt. ude STEP 1: STEP Ct.. STEP 3: 2, 13 IS TTH? ck trotted' tit 345 Atilia YOU? ANSWER’! USING A , HIT IT' S PEN? HIDE}?
Home Original Content Funny Pictures Funny GIFs YouTube Funny Text Funny Movies Channels Search

hide menu

how to math like asain

Ito' tei' , tatt. ude
STEP 1:
STEP Ct..
STEP 3:
2, 13 IS
TTH? ck
trotted'
tit
345
Atilia
YOU?
ANSWER’!
USING A , HIT IT' S PEN? HIDE}? F
TERI DON' T INHERE CHI.
tte'
...
+422
Views: 21562
Favorited: 257
Submitted: 06/29/2013
Share On Facebook
Add to favorites Subscribe to qubot E-mail to friend submit to reddit
Share image on facebook Share on StumbleUpon Share on Tumblr Share on Pinterest Share on Google Plus E-mail to friend

Comments(52):

[ 52 comments ]

Show All Replies Show Shortcuts
Show:   Top Rated Controversial Best Lowest Rated Newest Per page:
Order:
What do you think? Give us your opinion. Anonymous comments allowed.
User avatar #18 - McBalls (06/29/2013) [-]
Nigger, it is summer.
User avatar #17 - rochal (06/29/2013) [+] (1 reply)
I came here to laugh, not to math.
User avatar #36 - ssjkirby (06/29/2013) [+] (3 replies)
I can do it faster in my head. My process:
15*23
15*20 + 15*3
300 + 45
345
#32 - noket (06/29/2013) [+] (1 reply)
i prefer the classic method.. looks much more simplier.. at least if you know the times table.. wich usually you learn in first grade..
#9 - anonymous (06/29/2013) [+] (1 reply)
>no calculator


Phone?

This might have been interesting 15 years ago.
User avatar #16 to #9 - rochal (06/29/2013) [-]
some people still like to use this thing they were born with that actually has amazing computing capabilities called a brain, instead of just mindlessly putting things into a computer for an answer.
#55 - javalavalay **User deleted account** (06/29/2013) [-]
Why do you question our ancient asian ways?    
   
we are good at the mathematics. Why R u no risten to us?    
   
we teach bettah way.
Why do you question our ancient asian ways?

we are good at the mathematics. Why R u no risten to us?

we teach bettah way.
#52 - anonymous (06/29/2013) [-]
76 x 49
76/2 x 100 - 76
3800-76
3724

>counting a billion fucking lines instead of using algebraic properties
#39 - anonymous (06/29/2013) [-]
Or alternatively, you could just do simple multiplications like these in your head and save a lot of time.
#23 - thatoldguy (06/29/2013) [+] (2 replies)
User avatar #48 - Keril (06/29/2013) [-]
15*23
10*23+5*23
10*23=230
5*23=10*23/2=115
230+115=345
#59 - anonymous (06/30/2013) [-]
easy soncpet, but its literally the exact same as drawing out multiplication as groups of said number, except you dont have to count them afterwards. Basically, its an easier way to get to the answer without wwriting it out, the easiest way.


who am I kidding, calculator is the easiest way
User avatar #58 - sinery (06/30/2013) [-]
15*23 = 345

15*10 = 150
150*2 = 300
300+15+15+15 = 345

I have no idea what is going up there.
User avatar #37 - ritafoxyy ONLINE (06/29/2013) [-]
Workaholics Good Will Hunting
User avatar #22 - scottza (06/29/2013) [-]
Or learn vedic math and do any arithmatic problem in your head
User avatar #20 - swimmingprodigy (06/29/2013) [-]
sure let me just get out my colored pencils to multiply 6 by 7
User avatar #62 - apocalypticburrito (06/30/2013) [-]
10*23(230)+5*23(115)=345
drawing takes waaaaaaaaaaaaaaay to long
User avatar #61 - delphine (06/30/2013) [+] (1 reply)
I teach elementary, and even though in the grade I teach we don't cover multiplication or division, I know several methods of teaching it. I can multiply or divide large numbers very quickly in my head, comes in handy.
#26 - anonymous (06/29/2013) [-]
I always have pen and paper with me when I'm out and in the need of mathematical capabilities, and never my phone................
User avatar #25 - mylazy (06/29/2013) [-]
It seems pretty much exactly the way it is done by us, except they add a grid.
User avatar #15 - theguythatisnotyou (06/29/2013) [-]
I prefer traditional math.
[ 52 comments ]
Leave a comment
 Friends (0)