Upload
Login or register
Refresh Comments
Anonymous comments allowed.
asd
#102 - koojot
Reply +5
(02/24/2013) [-]
I do it this way
15 x 23

10 x 23 = 230
5 x 23 = 115
230 + 115 = 345
or

23 x 15
20 x 15 = 300
3 x 15 = 45
300 + 45 = 345
#169 to #102 - jouten
Reply 0
(02/24/2013) [-]
I always try to get the prime factors first

So 15*23=3*5*23=3*115=345
#209 to #169 - lolzordz
Reply 0
(02/24/2013) [-]
#218 to #209 - jouten
Reply 0
(02/24/2013) [-]
Like take 224*1775

Break it down to
112*3550
then
56*7100
28*14200
14*24400
7*48800=341600

Now if this is wrong it will be embarassing...
#220 to #218 - jouten
Reply 0
(02/24/2013) [-]
Ah correction it goes from
28*14200
to
14*28400
then
7*56800=397600
#229 to #220 - lolzordz
Reply +1
(02/24/2013) [-]
oh wait, are you halving one side and doubling the other to the simplest form? does that really work?
#230 to #229 - jouten
Reply +1
(02/24/2013) [-]
Yes, basically. You can do that because of the commutative property.


#231 to #230 - lolzordz
Reply +1
(02/24/2013) [-]
thats like the greatest thing i learned this whole month
#228 to #220 - lolzordz
Reply 0
(02/24/2013) [-]
i dont really have the head to follow this right now
i dont really have the head to follow this right now
#115 to #102 - acendia
Reply +2
(02/24/2013) [-]
10 x 23 = 230
230 / 2 = 115
115 + 230 = 345