Roughly. How i do math Source: Jormungand.
Home Original Content Funny Pictures Funny GIFs YouTube Funny Text Funny Movies Channels Search

hide menu

Roughly

How i do math
Source: Jormungand

  • Recommend tagsx
+1063
Views: 53729
Favorited: 47
Submitted: 05/03/2014
Share On Facebook
Add to favorites Subscribe to letrollzor Subscribe to animemanga E-mail to friend submit to reddit

Comments(198):

[ 198 comments ]

Show All Replies Show Shortcuts
Show:   Top Rated Controversial Best Lowest Rated Newest Per page:
Order:
What do you think? Give us your opinion. Anonymous comments allowed.
#1 - deezknuts (05/03/2014) [+] (15 replies)
its 385   
   
   
   
Whenever you multiply a double-digit number by 11, you just separated the two numbers and put their sum in the middle, like so   
   
22 x 11 = 242   
58 x 11 = 5 "13" 8 = 638   
72 x 11 = 792   
17 x = 187
its 385



Whenever you multiply a double-digit number by 11, you just separated the two numbers and put their sum in the middle, like so

22 x 11 = 242
58 x 11 = 5 "13" 8 = 638
72 x 11 = 792
17 x = 187
User avatar #16 to #1 - historybuff (05/03/2014) [-]
Or... Ooooor...

35 x 10 is 350
35 x 1 is 35
350 +35 is 385
#9 - include (05/03/2014) [+] (2 replies)
Comment Picture
#10 - whatareyouon ONLINE (05/03/2014) [+] (6 replies)
Yussss Jormungand was the **** .
#76 - badboyscout (05/04/2014) [+] (1 reply)
Fixed... using calculator
User avatar #6 - goldenfairy (05/03/2014) [+] (11 replies)
I think Jormungand was better than Black Lagoon.
#41 - shadowrated (05/04/2014) [+] (27 replies)
Okay reply to this comment and roll 2 numbers

*roll 2*

multiply it by 2

add 5

multiply by 50

If you already had your birthday this year add 1764
if you haven't had your birthday this year yet add 1763

subtract by the year you were born

Now you have a 3 or 4 digit number
The first 2 digits to the right is your age. The other numbers to the left are the numbers you rolled.
#22 - baogames (05/04/2014) [+] (1 reply)
everyone was shocked how bad his education was

when they all knew that he spent his entire life as an orphaned child-solider
#21 - deathklokiller (05/04/2014) [-]
****					 yeah!
**** yeah!
#171 - youmotherfather (05/04/2014) [-]
Wow, look at all the mathematicians. Seriously guys, just stop.
#120 - thechosentroll (05/04/2014) [+] (26 replies)
And here I am, an almost admitted engineering student, who spent 6 hours doing math problems today, preparing for an exam, going through comments of people happy they managed to do basic multiplication. Sometimes you ******* make it REALLY hard not to act condescending.

“Condescend” is a word that means “talk down to". You got that, kitten?
User avatar #127 to #120 - kyoutu (05/04/2014) [-]
Pfft, it's your job to be good at math. It ain't mine.
User avatar #100 - myfourthaccount (05/04/2014) [+] (1 reply)
Guys, everyone that has been to second grade knows how to do the problem. Stop making comments about how the answer is 385. I'm sure everyone knows.
User avatar #125 - kyoutu (05/04/2014) [+] (5 replies)
35 x 10 = 350
350 + 35 = 385

That's how I was always taught to do multiplication with large numbers in my head.
User avatar #101 - loodee (05/04/2014) [-]
I don't get what's so interesting or funny about this
#31 - hewhoepicfails (05/04/2014) [+] (4 replies)
Asians that can't do math? They have dishonored famiry! They even ****** up the first probrem!
User avatar #87 - rossafire ONLINE (05/04/2014) [+] (1 reply)
I love it how lots of cunts answer the math problems on FJ, even when it's something as simple as this, to make themselves feel more intelligent or some **** .
#75 - mankey (05/04/2014) [+] (3 replies)
This was my reaction whenever a question on an exam said "Estimate" THERE IS NO ******* ESTIMATE THERE IS RIGHT OR WRONG!

Do, or do not, there is no try.
#103 to #75 - killerofcows (05/04/2014) [-]
best estimates, options given 1800, 1900 and 2000
god dammit the answer was 17603
#23 - jinxter (05/04/2014) [-]
MFW people have to explain this...
MFW people have to explain this...
User avatar #97 - sociocat (05/04/2014) [+] (4 replies)
385 i did this in like 10 seconds
#105 to #97 - nimba (05/04/2014) [-]
good 4 u hers ur noble prise
User avatar #58 - bubblegumfaerie (05/04/2014) [+] (5 replies)
**** sake. I do the 35 times table everyday. I just got really frustrated when the guy couldn't get it. I need bed.
#71 to #70 - Zumwalt (05/04/2014) [-]
You are a kind and forgiving person. I am forever in your debt. Perhaps my repentance will be able to be re-payed in base 35 or even 17.
User avatar #2 - trollerfin (05/03/2014) [+] (2 replies)
just break it
35 x 11 = 300 + 30 + 50 +5 = 385

got bored did the other one as well
67 x 93 = 5400 + 180 +630 + 21 =6231
[ 198 comments ]
Leave a comment
 Friends (0)